THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 4:26:11 AM
Cowan, Juthaporn
CPSO#:
91210
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Dec 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Thai
Education: Mahidol University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Division of Infectious Diseases
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 79617
Fax: (613) 737-8352
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Thailand
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:17 Dec 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:17 Dec 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JUTHAPORN COWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COWAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 19 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 20 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases
University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Infectious Diseases
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2013 |