THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 10:08:52 AM
Aziz, Aly Shah Nadir
CPSO#:
91202
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University College of Dublin, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
581 Argus Road
Oakville ON L6J 3J4
Phone: 905 844 7444
Fax: 905 844 9444
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALY SHAH NADIR AZIZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZIZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Paediatric Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2015 |