THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 16:09:24 PM
Kassam, Shaqil
CPSO#:
91181
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Mar 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:29 Jul 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAQIL KASSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 27 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 28 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Mar 2015 |