THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 12:09:42 PM
Cassidy, Caitlin Margaret Rose
CPSO#:
91177
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Oct 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Oct 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Institute
Main Building D4-101N
550 Wellington Rd
London ON N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 646-6000 Ext. 45027
Fax: (519) 685-4009
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:12 Oct 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CAITLIN MARGARET ROSE CASSIDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASSIDY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Sep 2013 to 11 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 12 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Oct 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Oct 2014 |