THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:26:58 AM
Tang, Joyce
CPSO#:
91145
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
5 Fairview Mall Drive
Toronto ON M2J 2Z1
Phone: (416) 502-8100
Fax: (416) 502-8110
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOYCE TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |