THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 17:35:06 PM
Arora, Danny
CPSO#:
91130
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North Oakville Medical Centre
203 - 3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville, ON
L6M 1M1
Oakville ON L6M 1M1
Phone: 289-813-5075
Fax: 289-813-5082
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:31 Jul 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANNY ARORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARORA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 29 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 30 Jul 2010 to 29 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 30 Jul 2011 to 29 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 30 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 30 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2014 |