THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 7:36:14 AM
Brown Broderick, Jennifer Lynn
CPSO#:
91100
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa, ON K1H 8L6
T: 613-798-5555
Date Received: 02 Jun 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:16 Nov 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 16 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 2010 to 16 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 2011 to 16 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 16 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Oncology
University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 25 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2017 |