THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 15:35:54 PM
Varty, Kimberly Margaret
CPSO#:
91097
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1260 Golf Links Rd
Thunder Bay
Fort William Family Health Team
Thunder Bay ON P7B 0A1
Phone: 807 626 1234
Fax: 807 623 8832
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Atikokan General Hospital |
Atikokan |
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation |
Haliburton |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KIMBERLY MARGARET VARTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARTY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2011 |