THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:33:51 AM
Gauvin, Lianne
CPSO#:
91074
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Feb 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Feb 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Box 1270
1403 Edward Street
Hearst ON P0L 1N0
Phone: 705-362-7511
Fax: (705) 362-4184
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) |
Hearst |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 Feb 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LIANNE GAUVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAUVIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 13 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 14 Feb 2011 to 13 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Feb 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Feb 2012 |