THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:08:41 AM
Bennett, Mark Robert Gerald
CPSO#:
91065
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Sep 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Sep 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Anxiety Treatment & Research Centre
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 35373
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Aug 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARK ROBERT GERALD BENNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENNETT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2014 |