THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:07:55 AM
Petkiewicz, Stephanie Lynn
CPSO#:
91055
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Pathology
4th Floor CCW Room W4220
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 79627
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE LYNN PETKIEWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETKIEWICZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 25 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 26 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 27 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 28 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2016 |