THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 2:25:59 AM
Hwang, Eun A
CPSO#:
91038
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
02 Dec 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Supervised Short Duration Practice
as of
17 Nov 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Korean
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre, Otolaryngology, M1-102, 2075 Bayview Avenue, Toronto, ON, M4N 3M5
Date Received: 13 May 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2022 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Dec 2022 |