THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 21:30:42 PM
Fantaneanu, Tadeu Andrei
CPSO#:
91037
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Feb 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Feb 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Romanian, Spanish
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TADEU ANDREI FANTANEANU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FANTANEANU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Feb 2016 |