THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 14:46:49 PM
Aw, Andrew Ta Wei
CPSO#:
91031
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Aug 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
CPCR Building, Box 704
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: 613 737 8899 Ext. 71062
Fax: 613 761 4521
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:07 Nov 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW TA WEI AW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AW is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Clinician Investigator
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2013 |