THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 8:48:47 AM
Williams, Kona Kristen Chant
CPSO#:
91025
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jan 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jan 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: 705-523-7100 Ext. 8122
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:20 Dec 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Forensic Pathology |
Effective:20 Dec 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KONA KRISTEN CHANT WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 20 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 21 Dec 2010 to 20 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 20 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 21 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 21 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 21 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Dec 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2016 |