THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 10:50:53 AM
Singh, Ravi Paul
CPSO#:
91012
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Feb 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Feb 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: 705-522-2200 Ext. 7147
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Feb 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAVI PAUL SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 07 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 08 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 13 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Feb 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Feb 2012 |