THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:31:40 AM
Sidhu, Amneet Kaur
CPSO#:
91011
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Nov 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Divison of Neonatology
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73623
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:24 Aug 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMNEET KAUR SIDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDHU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 24 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Aug 2011 to 24 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 24 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Nov 2014 |