THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 0:15:19 AM
Sakanovic, Alenko
CPSO#:
91003
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Bosnian, Croatian, English, Serbian
Education: University of Ottawa, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1053 Carling Avenue
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
J153
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613-798-5555 Ext. 18779
Fax: 613-761-4015
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital |
Hawkesbury |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2021 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALENKO SAKANOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAKANOVIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2023 to 31 Jul 2023
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |