THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 7:39:14 AM
Paquette, Stephanie
CPSO#:
90990
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Nov 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hawkesbury and District
General Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynecology
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON K6A 3E5
Phone: 6136321111 Ext. 52001
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital |
Hawkesbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:19 Nov 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE PAQUETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAQUETTE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 10 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 11 Feb 2012 to 10 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 11 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 19 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2015 |