THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 13:36:40 PM
Myron, Hilary Stephanie
CPSO#:
90982
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Aug 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
Ottawa ON K1J 8L1
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 4315
Fax: (613) 907-8027
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:31 Jul 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HILARY STEPHANIE MYRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYRON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 17 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 18 Jan 2011 to 17 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 18 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2014 to 31 May 2015
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2014 |