THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:57:52 AM
Hambly, Nathan Daniel Morley
CPSO#:
90964
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Aug 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: 905-522-1155 Ext. 36704
Fax: 905-529-6515
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jul 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:21 Oct 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NATHAN DANIEL MORLEY HAMBLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMBLY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine
McMaster University, 31 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine
McMaster University, 31 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Respiratory Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2013 |