THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:49:33 AM
Bresee, Natalie Rose Anna
CPSO#:
90952
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
C H E O
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:19 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NATALIE ROSE ANNA BRESEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRESEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 06 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 07 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 06 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 07 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 06 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 07 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 08 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2015 |