THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 19:21:20 PM
Mihok, Marika Linn
CPSO#:
90944
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Armstrong, Marika Linn (used until: 01 Aug 2012 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
201-1370 Clyde Ave
Nepean ON K2G 3H8
Phone: 613-722-8086
Fax: 613-761-1944
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:29 Jul 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIKA LINN MIHOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIHOK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2011 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2013 |