THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 6:57:49 AM
Becker, Henry M
CPSO#:
90923
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jan 2024
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Toronto, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
222 Lansdowne Ave
Toronto ON M6K 3C6
Phone: 647-725-6555
Electoral District: 10
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients that were seen by Dr. Henry Becker at his Lansdowne Avenue office can request their medical record by contacting: 222 Lansdowne Avenue, Toronto, ON., M6K 3C6, Telephone: 647-725-6555
Patients that were seen by Doctor Henry Becker at the Grey Bruce Health Services, Owen Sound Emergency Department can contact the hospital’s Health Records Department : 519-376-2121, ext. 2259, or email: [email protected]
Date Received: 21 Sep 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2018 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HENRY M BECKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BECKER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 25 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 16 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 17 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2023 to 09 Apr 2023
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2023 to 09 Apr 2023
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2018 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Apr 2023 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 21 Apr 2023 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 2024 |