THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 2:16:43 AM
Laidley, Ian Frederick
CPSO#:
90910
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Aug 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrance Hill Street
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Brant Community Healthcare System,Willett Site |
Paris |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:13 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IAN FREDERICK LAIDLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAIDLEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Aug 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 2015 |