THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 13:26:08 PM
Gholizadeh-Ahangari, Shirin
CPSO#:
90908
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Kashan Univ. of Medical Sc & Health Serv, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 5
9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON L4C 0Y7
Phone: (905) 597-2528
Fax: (905) 597-2536
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHIRIN GHOLIZADEH-AHANGARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOLIZADEH-AHANGARI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Aug 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 2012 |