THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 3:03:25 AM
Spring, Shanna
CPSO#:
90875
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jan 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jan 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
401 Smyth Road
Children's Hospital of Eastern Onta
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: 613-737-7600
Fax: 613-738-4298
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHANNA SPRING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPRING is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
CF - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2015 |