THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 17:56:26 PM
Petrescu, Nicolae
CPSO#:
90860
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Romanian
Education: University of Toronto, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
825 Coxwell Avenue
Neurology Clinic
Division of Neurology
Main Floor - T1 Medical Clinics
Toronto ON M4J 5C2
Phone: 4164696406
Fax: 4164696584
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NICOLAE PETRESCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRESCU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |