THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 17:04:32 PM
Mohareb, Michael Moheb
CPSO#:
90844
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 494 2120 Ext. 30111
Fax: (416) 747 3565
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:05 Nov 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL MOHEB MOHAREB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAREB is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Feb 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 2013 |