THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 1:23:54 AM
Lynde, Carrie Beatrice
CPSO#:
90834
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Dec 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Lynde Institute For Dermatology
25 Main Street North
Markham ON L3P 1X3
Phone: (905) 472-9950
Fax: (905) 472-3366
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:31 Dec 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CARRIE BEATRICE LYNDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LYNDE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 02 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Dec 2014 |