THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 21:48:19 PM
Farooqui, Susanne
CPSO#:
90824
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
09 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Tracy, Susanne (used until: 01 Feb 2016 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. Matthew's University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Leamington District Memorial Hosp.
Department of General Surgery
194 Talbot Street West, 3rd Floor
Leamington ON N8H 1N9
Phone: (519) 322-4933
Fax: (519) 322-1952
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Erie Shores HealthCare |
Leamington |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:09 Jun 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Jun 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 08 Dec 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 03 Feb 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 08 May 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 19 Oct 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 22 Jun 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 15 Jun 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 15 Jun 2021 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 15 Jun 2021 |
|
Active |