THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 20:58:58 PM
Almakki, Nazar Elnour Mohamed
CPSO#:
90811
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Sep 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Khartoum, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite # 202
3630 Lawrence Ave East
Scarborough ON M1G 1P6
Phone: (416) 792-0836
Fax: (416) 792-0837
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 May 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:09 Apr 2015 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:09 Apr 2015 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NAZAR ELNOUR MOHAMED ALMAKKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALMAKKI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Jun 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 12 May 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2009 |