THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 18:57:29 PM
Hesse, Daniel Kluth
CPSO#:
90793
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Kingston General Hospital, 76 Stuart Street, Kingston, ON K7L 2V7
Date Received: 16 May 2016
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Minnesota
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |