THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 17:10:54 PM
Abdelshaheed, Tamer
CPSO#:
90761
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Sep 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Specialty Clinic
3865 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Suite 106
Vaughan ON L4H 4P4
Phone: 9054179600
Fax: 9055533733
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital |
Vaughan |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Jul 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:21 Oct 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TAMER ABDELSHAHEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDELSHAHEED is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2013 |