THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 22:50:06 PM
Da Rosa, Michael Robert
CPSO#:
90747
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: 905 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital |
Vaughan |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nuclear Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL ROBERT DA ROSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DA ROSA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Nuclear Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Nuclear Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |