THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 2:41:32 AM
Chau, Heidi Hoy-Yin
CPSO#:
90732
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
9942 108 St NW
Edmonton AB T5K 2J5
Phone: 780-342-7784
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Heidi Chau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 19 2016
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HEIDI HOY-YIN CHAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |