THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:39:36 AM
Kashfi, Arash
CPSO#:
90720
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Persian
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
596 Davis Dr
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: 905-895-4521
Fax: 905-952-3057
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ARASH KASHFI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASHFI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 19 Oct 2009
AVP - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2012 to 28 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |