THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 13:04:38 PM
Baweja, Reena Kaur
CPSO#:
90673
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Nov 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 May 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical Sch, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
474 Columbia St
Welcome Back Clinic
Kamloops BC V2C 2T5
Phone: 778-471-9271
Fax: 250-434-1400
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:17 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. REENA KAUR BAWEJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAWEJA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 19 Oct 2009
AVP - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Dec 2020
CF - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Nov 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Nov 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 May 2021 |