THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:42:33 AM
Bradshaw, Scott H
CPSO#:
90671
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
115 Midair Court
Brampton ON L6T 5V1
Phone: 1 800-668-2714
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:22 May 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SCOTT H BRADSHAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRADSHAW is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 10 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Oct 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 2015 |