THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 23:47:57 PM
Zhang, Natalya Nuo
CPSO#:
90660
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German, Mandarin
Education: McMaster University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4001 Leslie St
North York General Hospital - Acute
Room GS-71A
No new referrals. Former pts welcom
North York ON M2K 1E1
Phone: 647-317-1973 Ext. Evoice
Fax: 1-888-550-7067
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NATALYA NUO ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |