THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 6:44:29 AM
Udovic, Lisa Ann
CPSO#:
90656
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Wilson, Lisa Ann (used until: 15 Oct 2009 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate ,
Oakville, Ontario
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Ext. 4647
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:07 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LISA ANN UDOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UDOVIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 16 Apr 2011 to 15 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 16 Apr 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 18 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 18 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 18 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 17 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Dec 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Aug 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2016 |