THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 1:51:25 AM
Shoop, Rebecca Rachel
CPSO#:
90642
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jan 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jan 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: McMaster University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Monkhouse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 17 2017
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Dec 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:04 Nov 2020 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. REBECCA RACHEL SHOOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOOP is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Dec 2010 to 30 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 2012 |