THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:52:57 AM
Rhyno, Mark Stuart
CPSO#:
90634
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Sep 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Sep 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
500-649 Scottsdale Dr
Guelph ON N1G 4T7
Phone: 5198374444
Fax: 5198372202
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARK STUART RHYNO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RHYNO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2014 |