THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 21:52:57 PM
Furlan, Julio Cesar
CPSO#:
90628
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Sep 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 May 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: University of Sao Paulo, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Lyndhurst Centre
520 Sutherland Drive
Room 206J
Toronto ON M4G 3V9
Phone: (416) 597-3422
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Lyndhurst Centre |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:14 May 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JULIO CESAR FURLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FURLAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Neurology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 May 2016 |