THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:01:52 AM
Isfahanian, Naghmeh
CPSO#:
90627
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Persian
Education: Hamadan Medical School, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
140 Academy Street
Presque Isle ME 04769
United States
Phone: 2072273084
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:03 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NAGHMEH ISFAHANIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISFAHANIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 24 May 2012 to 23 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 24 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 24 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 May 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 2015 |