THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 8:56:49 AM
Awan, Kokab Imtiaz Ahmad
CPSO#:
90618
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of Cluj, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
201 - 1055 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London ON N6G 0W7
Phone: (519) 645-0146
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lake of the Woods District Hospital |
Kenora |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
West Parry Sound Health Centre |
Parry Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 May 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KOKAB IMTIAZ AHMAD AWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AWAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
AVP - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 22 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 06 Jan 2014 to 26 Jan 2014
EL - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 27 Jan 2014 to 17 Feb 2014
EL - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 18 Feb 2014 to 06 Mar 2014
EL - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 04 May 2015 to 29 May 2015
EL - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology
Queen's University, 20 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Mar 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 May 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 May 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2018 |