THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 21:20:06 PM
Heineck, Katja Monique
CPSO#:
90586
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German, Spanish
Education: McMaster University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
130 Merton St
Toronto ON M4S 1A4
Phone: 416-481-5099
Fax: 416-481-2590
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Heineck Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 2 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Jul 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KATJA MONIQUE HEINECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEINECK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 17 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jul 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 2011 |