THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 17:01:31 PM
O'Connor, David Jonathan
CPSO#:
90572
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Beaver, David Jonathan (used until: 09 Aug 2017 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
459 Hume St
Collingwood ON L9Y1W9
Phone: (705) 445-2550
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital |
Collingwood |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:19 Oct 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID JONATHAN O'CONNOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'CONNOR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2011 |