THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 1:31:43 AM
Sharma, Sapna
CPSO#:
90535
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jul 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Department of Obstetrics/Gynecology
H S C 4D9
1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Maternal Fetal Medicine |
Effective:27 Sep 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAPNA SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 29 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine
McMaster University, 29 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 2017 |