THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 2:24:34 AM
Ng, Wendy Kar Yee
CPSO#:
90525
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
396 S. Main St., Suite 200
ORANGE CA 92868
United States
Phone: 7149886330
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Arizona
USA - California
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WENDY KAR YEE NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |